THE LAWRANCE MESSER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IT IS A GRANT MAKING CHARITY AND THE TRUSTEES SEEK THEIR OWN CAUSES TO SUPPORT RATHER THAN INVITE UNSOLICITED APPLICATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 November 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 1986: Standard registration
- 05 October 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 October 2011: Funds transferred to 327154 THE PATRICIA BAINES TRUST
- THE LAWRENCE MESSER CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/11/2006 | 17/11/2007 | 17/11/2008 | 17/11/2009 | 17/11/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.21k | £12.88k | £51.06k | £9.53k | £9.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £8.49k | £17.24k | £16.13k | £23.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 November 2010 | 01 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2009 | 03 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2008 | 08 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2008 | 08 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 November 2007 | 16 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2007 | 17 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window