RETT SYNDROME ASSOCIATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rett Syndrome is a complex neurological condition, genetic in origin, resulting in profound multiple learning and physical disabilities. We offer telephone support/counselling, & local peer support groups . We fund research & seek to maintain momentum towards eventual cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- RETT SYNDROME ASSOCIATION U K - R S A U K (Working name)
- RETT UK (Working name)
- UK RETT SYNDROME ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.78k | £326.16k | £322.30k | £494.23k | £335.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.36k | £311.96k | £346.41k | £477.85k | £415.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 02 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1995,1 NOVEMBER 1997,16 OCTOBER 2004 & 17 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE, TREATMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM RETT SYNDROME; TO SUPPORT, SUSTAIN AND ASSIST THOSE CARING FOR RETT SYNDROME SUFFERERS WHETHER THEY BE PARENTS, CARERS OR PROFESSIONALS; TO PROMOTE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF THE SYNDROME; AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF RETT SYNDROME AND TO DISSEMINATE OR PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window