THE GREAT NORTH RUN CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Northumberland
Governance
- 23 December 1986: Standard registration
- 16 January 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 13 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETIC AND PHYSICAL TRAINING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS SUCH PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO INCLUDE NOT ONLY THE PROVISION OF LAND BUILDINGS EQUIPMENT AND OTHER TANGIBLE FACILITIES BUT ALSO COACHING INSTRUCTION AND THE ORGANISATION OF EVENTS CONCERNED WITH ATHLETIC OR PHYSICAL TRAINING BUT SO THAT SUCH FACILITIES SHALL BE PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ACCORDINGLY SHALL BE PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDEN AND EITHER I THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; OR II SUCH FACILITIES ARE TO BE AVAILABLE TO THE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. (B) IN THE COURSE OF SUCH ASSISTANCE AS IS REFERRED TO IN SUBCLAUSE (A) OF THIS CLAUSE TO PROVIDE SUBSIDIES GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCE TO ANY CHARITABLE COMPANY TRUST BODY OR ORGANISATION IN ORDER TO ENABLE THAT COMPANY TRUST BODY OR ORGANISATION TO PROVIDE THE SAID FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window