Accounts and annual returns SRI LANKAN CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 327317
Charity reporting is overdue by 1607 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 513 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 513 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 878 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 878 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1243 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1243 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1607 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1607 days