Financial history THE HARLEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.80k £11.63k £26.46k £10.39k £113.97k
Total expenditure £25.44k £12.69k £27.75k £13.60k £15.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A