Trustees THE NATIONAL COACHING FOUNDATION
Charity number: 327354

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Atholl Scott Duncan | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adi Baunitoga Jessica Hickin Dolo Fawcett | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karim Harbott | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rosemary Bunbury | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Hepworth | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalynd Kay Ranganathan | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ann Bramley | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Eveold Rattigan | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.