THE CHILD PSYCHOTHERAPY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 February 1987: Standard registration
- 14 December 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 December 2005: Funds transferred to 1097004 THE CHILD PSYCHOTHERAPY TRUST
- C P T (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES BY ADVANCING EDUCATION ABOUT THE APPLICATION OF PSYCHOANALYTIC PRINCIPLES AND TECKNIQUES TO THE STUDY OF CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND TO THE UNDERSTANDING AND TREATMENT OF EMOTIONAL AND/OR PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCES IN CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window