SPINNAKER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 March 1987: Standard registration
- 08 December 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 December 2006: Funds transferred to 1111351 SPINNAKER TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.16k | £113.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.16k | £120.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 17 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 17 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATES 2 FEBRUARY 1987 AND VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRUST'S DOCTRINAL BASIS. TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND POVERTY CONSEQUENT UPON THEEFFECT OF PERSONAL,LOCAL,NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window