Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ASHTON HOUSE HOSPITAL FUND

Charity number: 1050046-1
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 04/06/1997, 25/4/2002 AND 31/10/2007
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR ASHTON HOUSE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 11 October 1996: Standard registration
Other names

No other names