THE GEOFFREY REDMAN-BROWN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 1987: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 26 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT ARE REQUESTED BUT NOT REQUIRED TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH AS A PRIMARY OBJECT IN ADMINISTERING THE CHARITY THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONGST THE AGED RESULTING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS AND ITS EFFECTS WHETHER PHYSICAL PHYCHOLOGICAL OR SOCIAL AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING RESULTING FROM ILLNESS AND ITS EFFECS AS AFORESAID AMONGST FREEMASONS THEIR RELATIVES AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window