THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF ANOMALOUS PHENOMENA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide education and training to the public, offering training days and courses throughout the year as well as online training via our website. We also provide technical assistance and charitable funding for scientific research projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 1987: Standard registration
- 16 June 2023: Funds received from 265787 SURVIVAL JOINT RESEARCH COMMITTEE TRUST
- A S S A P (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Hume | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roy Wilcox | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sherna Denise Young | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pilkington | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kristian Lander | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Ball | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Daniel Norton | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Eyre | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Parsons | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norie Anne MILES | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.12k | £6.58k | £16.69k | £21.63k | £25.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56k | £6.68k | £8.37k | £21.43k | £24.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18TH NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 2007. as amended on 01 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY OBTAINING, STORING AND PROCESSING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION CONCERNING THOSE AREAS OF HUMAN EXPERIENCE AND OBSERVED PHENOMENA FOR WHICH THERE IS NOT GENERAL EXPLANATION AT PRESENT AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATIONS INTO SUCH PHENOMENA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63/66 Hatton Garden
Fifth Floor Suite 23
London
EC1N 8LE
- Phone:
- 020 8798 3981
- Email:
- secretary@assap.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window