Trustees THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF ANOMALOUS PHENOMENA

Charity number: 327422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen John Hume Trustee 02 May 2025
None on record
Roy Wilcox Trustee 26 April 2025
None on record
Sherna Denise Young Trustee 26 April 2025
None on record
Sarah Pilkington Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Kristian Lander Trustee 10 January 2025
None on record
David Ball Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Lee Daniel Norton Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
William Eyre Trustee 10 December 2023
None on record
Steve Parsons Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Norie Anne MILES Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record