Accounts and annual returns THE NEPALESE CHILDREN'S MEDICAL TRUST

Charity number: 327503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 February 2024 15 days late
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required