THE WORKING HORSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Working Horse Trust's principal activity is the keeping of heavy horses in order to help preserve them. Throughout the year we attend a variety of events, hold open days and undertake work with our horses to encourage wider interest, support and ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Lionel Ryan | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE BRANSCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £2.57k | £1.98k | £1.80k | £2.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.09k | £15.01k | £19.99k | £25.02k | £11.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 1988 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE INDUSTRY COMMERCE AGRICULTURE AND FORESTRY BY PRESERVING AND IMPROVING THE STANDARD OF THE WORKING HORSE AND OTHER LIVESTOCK AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE BREEDING TRAINING AND CARE OF THE WORKING HORSE AND OTHER LIVESTOCK. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR SCHOOLCHILDREN IN THE HERITAGE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE HOME-CRAFTS COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE HEALTH OF THE SOIL. (III) TO PROMOTE AMONG THE PUBLIC HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY EDUCATING THEM IN THE CARE AND CONSIDERATION FOR WORKING HORSES AND OTHER LIVESTOCK AND PARTICULARLY LIVESTOCK IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION. (IV) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO PREPARE THEMSELVES FOR TRADES OCCUPATIONS AND SERVICES IN INDUSTRY COMMERCE AGRICULTURE HORTICULTURE AND FORESTRY AND THEREBY TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE. (V) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE USE OF THE WORKING HORSE AND OTHER LIVESTOCK IN INDUSTRY COMMERCE AGRICULTURE AND FORESTRY AND INTO HERITAGE AND ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURE HORTICULTURE HOME-CRAFTS COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 BERRYLANDS ROAD
SURBITON
KT5 8PA
- Phone:
- 0208 390 7351
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window