THE MUSTARDSEED ARTS AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist those in need in the UK, Kenya and Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Haringey
- Oxfordshire
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 August 1987: Standard registration
- GEORGEVILLE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yoji Caird | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Katherine Popplewell | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAOKO CAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £498.94k | £449.81k | £411.33k | £284.96k | £332.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770.78k | £559.15k | £299.76k | £350.17k | £295.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 MARCH 1987 TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/03/1987 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/05/2011
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITALBE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 DRUMMOND DRIVE
STANMORE
HA7 3PD
- Phone:
- 02089549999
- Email:
- johncairdweb@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window