FREEDOM MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian Charity with a bias towards enabeling people with disabilities. Our activities include Evangelism through assemblies, lessons, clubs, conferences, camps missions. Bible teaching in Churches, Conferences and Camps. Disability awareness through assemblies, lessons, clubs, confeneces, camps, missions. We also produce media, books, articles, extracts, tapes, CD's, video.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 1987: Standard registration
- 27 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £13.77k | £15.86k | £13.50k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.73k | £17.47k | £17.07k | £13.75k | £35 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 01 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 20 July 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE WHOLLY CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE FOSTER AND ADVANCE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES AND STATES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FAITH (REGARDLESS OF DENOMINATION) BY COMMUNICATING AND SPREADING THE GOOD NEWS OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL BY EVANGELISM AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND BY THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN MINISTERS BOTH ORDAINED AND LAY CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES AND PERSONS OF EVERY RACE COLOUR OR CREED WHO ARE UNAWARE OF OR NOT YET COMMITTED TO THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window