FAITH WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Faith Welfare Trust promotes the welfare of disadvantaged and/or destitute children and young adults. It also supports disadvantaged children and young adults in their education and training. To do this it funds 2 children's homes (boys and girls) near Chennai (Tamil Nadu) and a school in Rajahmundry (Andhra Pradesh) where free places and lunches are provided for needy children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 28 September 1987: Standard registration
- FAITH WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- FELLOWSHIP WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TESSA MARY SAYERS | Chair |
|
||||||
David Shipley | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
joanne hutchison | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS SAYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN TUGWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR COOMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE JEAN TUGWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.63k | £49.44k | £176.21k | £46.75k | £58.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.38k | £53.71k | £55.29k | £60.90k | £95.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/08/1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/04/2014 as amended on 29 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DISADVANTAGED AND/OR DESTITUTE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (2) TO SUPPORT DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
SUBCONTINENT OF INDIA WITH PRIMARY RESPONSIBILITY IN MADRAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 The Village
Acklington
Morpeth
NE65 9BL
- Phone:
- 01670760620
- Email:
- fwt.news@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window