Accounts and annual returns THE SHANE GISBOROUGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327614
Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 03 March 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 03 March 2023 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 March 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required