LYNX EDUCATIONAL TRUST FOR ANIMAL WELFARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building awareness of species which are becoming extinct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Kentish | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HILARY COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lin Watson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.13k | £21.93k | £22.97k | £25.06k | £11.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.56k | £14.52k | £29.15k | £25.10k | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMEORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE AND IN PARTICULAR BY; 1. PROMOTING AND CONDUCTING COURSES OF SCHOLASTIC INSTRUCTION AND BY MEANS OF LECTURES, DOCUMENTARY FILMS, AUDIO VISUAL AND FACT SHEETS. 2. PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING OR UNDERTAKEING RESEARCH AND EXPERIMENTAL WORK AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Farrow Close
Mattishall
DEREHAM
Norfolk
NR20 3SZ
- Phone:
- 01284765105
- Email:
- lynne.kentish@talk21.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window