Financial history THE KEN AND EDNA MORRISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £173.51k £141.71k £172.46k £206.14k £182.74k
Total expenditure £170.34k £101.58k £222.94k £233.30k £202.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A