Financial history THE SIR HUGH AND LADY SYKES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £154.70k £167.47k £147.08k £106.78k £92.02k
Total expenditure £307.62k £190.04k £67.24k £46.45k £32.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A