AGF CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION OF THE CHARITY VIA THE WEBSITE OF THE AGF PENSIONERS' ASSOCIATION. REGULAR TRUSTEE MEETINGS TO CONSIDER ANY APPLICATIONS FOR ASSISTANCE & TO REVIEW THE FINANCIAL POSITION OF THE TRUST. ONE APPLICATION RECEIVED FOR ASSISTANCE, BUT IT DID NOT MEET THE TRUSTEES CURRENT CRITERIA FOR CONSIDERATION. FOUR DONATIONS WERE MADE TO OTHER CHARITIES, TOTALLING £8,000.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 January 1988: Standard registration
- 12 April 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- N E M CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £1.01k | £1.10k | £1.39k | £1.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55 | £60 | £8.06k | £6.16k | £6.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 26 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE TO SUCH A CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES INCLUDING BUT NOT BEING LIMITED TO THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF THE SETTLOR AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window