Accounts and annual returns DAVID EASTEAL TRUST

Charity Number: 327674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 March 2025 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 May 2024 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 December 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required