CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' LIVERY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 1988: Standard registration
- CALC (Working name)
- WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS IN ENGLAND AND WALES GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEVERLEY TURNER | Chair | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Grosvenor | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lewis Jenkins | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VICTOR MATTHEWS | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Ann O'Neill | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES WATSON | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
SUSAN FIELD | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.66k | £219.90k | £235.93k | £221.10k | £237.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.95k | £282.08k | £214.34k | £200.46k | £218.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/01/1988 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2015
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (4) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 THE AVENUE
WELWYN
HERTFORDSHIRE
AL6 0PP
- Phone:
- 07939047845
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window