Financial history Independent Provider of Special Education Advice

Charity number: 327691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £634.91k £851.50k £834.66k £870.78k £1.10m
Total expenditure £622.75k £572.36k £691.25k £814.50k £988.79k
Income from government contracts £28.00k £26.50k £24.29k N/A £32.81k
Income from government grants N/A £17.84k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £195.56k £475.26k £377.37k £341.06k £407.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £439.10k £376.08k £457.20k £526.02k £677.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £250 £119 £91 £3.69k £14.98k
Income - Other £0 £50 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £540.82k £513.99k £632.05k £741.48k £929.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.92k £58.37k £59.20k £73.02k £59.63k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.51k £23.75k £17.08k £29.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0