HEALTH AID (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing medical and other long term support to children in Romania who are HIV+,assisting surgical teams in Ethiopia and supporting local low-income families in the UK by offering good quality household goods and clothing at prices they can afford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
- Ethiopia
- Romania
Governance
- 28 January 1988: Standard registration
- 25 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEALTH AID (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.02k | £29.02k | £23.12k | £20.26k | £17.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.53k | £32.07k | £25.21k | £22.22k | £27.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 02 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 21ST NOVEMBER 1991 as amended on 20 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, RESULTING FROM POVERTY, FAMINE, NATURAL DISASTER OR OTHER PUBLIC CALAMITY AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE RECRUITMENT, SELECTION AND SENDING OUT OF VOLUNTEERS, INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL STAFF AND PARAMEDICAL STAFF FOR SHORT TERM SERVICE OVERSEAS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN THE AREAS AFORESAID IN BASIC HEALTH CARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF PROTECTING THEIR HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window