THE PILKINGTON ANGLO-JAPANESE CULTURAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of UK Culture in Japan and promotion of Japanese Culture in the UK through publications, exchange exhibitions and research projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Japan
Governance
- 25 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN PILKINGTON | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY:- EDUCATING THE BRITISH PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY GEOGRAPHY ART LITERATURE AND MUSIC OF JAPAN AND (2) EDUCATING THE JAPANESE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY GEOGRAPHY ART LITERATURE AND MUSIC OF THE BRITISH ISLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat F
5 Lansdowne Road
LONDON
W11 3AL
- Phone:
- 07468580880
- Email:
- brianpilkington@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window