THE TRAVELLERS' SCHOOL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a UK wide grass-roots organisation. It exists to advance the education and opportunities of children of a nomadic way of life. We provide educational projects, support and resources to Traveller children and we aim to assist them in developing into capable self-sufficient individuals, that can exist as valuable members of society and that remain proud of their own cultures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 February 1988: Standard registration
- 01 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE TRAVELLERS' SCHOOL (Working name)
- TRAVELLERS' SCHOOL CHARITY (TSC) (Working name)
- THE TRAVELLER'S SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.16k | £285 | £131 | £24 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.23k | £393 | £744 | £225 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 February 2019 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH JANUARY 1988 DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN ESPECIALLY THOSE WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE OF A NOMADIC HABIT OF LIFE AND TO PROVIDE THEM WITH FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY BOTH AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window