Accounts and annual returns THE STEVEN AND JOAN FOGEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 June 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 June 2024 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 March 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 January 2022 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required