THE MILITARY VEHICLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage the preservation and restoration of historic military vehicles To liaise with DVLA in the verification of historic military vehicles To preserve literature, films and other relevant documents and artefacts pertaining to historic military vehicles To act/negotiate for our members on any relevant legislation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
74 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 1988: Standard registration
- THE MVT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Parker | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hamblin | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Hawks | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Boyan Holmes | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Newbould | Trustee | 15 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BROMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.37k | £184.17k | £191.24k | £198.91k | £203.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.26k | £148.06k | £157.45k | £153.67k | £179.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF MILITARY VEHICLES OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND THE PRESERVATION OF BOOKS, DRAWINGS, RECORDS, DOCUMENTS, SOUND AND VISUAL RECORDINGS, RECORDINGS, CINEMATOGRAPH FILMS, AND PHOTOGRAPHS RELATING TO SUCH VEHICLES, THEIR HISTORY AND THEIR DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOKLANDS
WATER STREET
MARTOCK
TA12 6JP
- Phone:
- 07944316924
- Email:
- TREASURER@MVT.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window