Financial history INDIAN GROUND WORK

Charity number: 327770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/02/2020 18/02/2021 18/02/2022 18/02/2023 18/02/2024
Total gross income £18.04k £250 £10 £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.27k £0 £250 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A