Financial history THE GIFT TRUST

Charity number: 327779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.44k £5.79k £6.33k £5.97k £7.14k
Total expenditure £4.30k £4.62k £7.38k £5.39k £6.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A