Financial history THE PREVO TRUST

Charity number: 327784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £18.49k £13.25k £22.85k £14.26k £141.85k
Total expenditure £71.36k £43.64k £43.08k £31.21k £61.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A