SID VALE - AFRICA LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sidvale Africa Link is a small charity that promotes friendship and cooperation between the people of the Sid Valley in East Devon and the people of the Bolero District in Northern Malawi. Since 1986 this charity has assisted the people of Bolero with various agricultural and educational projects. There have, over the years, been many visits to the area by people from East Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Malawi
Governance
- 10 May 1988: Standard registration
- SID VALE AFRICA LINK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBERT LOVELACE PENROSE HODGSON PHD MICE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER CLIFFORD WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE MARGARET ELIZABETH KINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45 | £45 | £35 | £25 | £25 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £430 | £430 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF THE PEOPLE OF AFRICA AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE BOLERA DISTRICT OF MALAWI THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE KAPYERE CO-OPERATIVE AND OTHER INDIVIDUAL PROJECTS WITHIN AFRICA WHICH SHALL BE SELECTED AND VOTED UPON BY THE SID VALE/AFRICA LINK.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 SUMMERFIELD
SIDMOUTH
EX10 9RY
- Phone:
- 01395512295
- Email:
- rogerwhite36@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window