Financial history THE STEFAN BATORY TRUST

Charity Number: 327797
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £10.26k £0
Total expenditure £277 £0 £0 £9.03k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A