DAVID URI MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 327810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The core activity is that of making grants to charitable institutions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £284,624
Total expenditure: £210,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS ZENA SANDRA BLACKMAN Chair
None on record
BENJAMIN THEODORE BLACKMAN Trustee
None on record
BIANCA ROSE RODEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £229.07k £248.14k £199.25k £370.51k £284.62k
Total expenditure £176.88k £188.08k £122.40k £157.27k £210.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
244 VAUXHALL BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SW1V 1AU
Phone:
02078288899
Email:
dumt@duvt.com
Website:

No information available