RHINOLOGY AND LARYNGOLOGY RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust activities continue to be that of the pursuance of improved care for patients with ear, nose and throat problems, including allergies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 1988: Standard registration
- RHINOLOGY RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- THE RHINOLOGY RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON GANE | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA GERRISH | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID J HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR VALERIE J LUND CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.08k | £7.99k | £17.97k | £3.48k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.30k | £44.24k | £10.74k | £17.76k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFORESAID) BY PROMOTING:- (I) THE STUDY OF DISEASES AND DISORDERS OF THE NOSE AND SINUSES AND GENERALLY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE MEANS OF PREVENTION DIAGNOSIS AND OTHER METHODS OF TREATMENT AND CARE OF SUCH DISEASES. (II) RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION INTO THE CAUSES OF SUCH DISEASES AND DISORDERS AND THE POSIBILITIES OF PREVENTION ALLEVIATION OR CURE AND TO DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KERSHEN FAIRFAX LTD
113 KINGSWAY
LONDON
WC2B 6PP
- Phone:
- 02072699559
- Email:
- profit@kershen-fairfax.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window