Financial history TAQWA FOUNDATION (TF)

Charity number: 327826
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £16.75k £14.55k £11.58k £8.55k £10.26k
Total expenditure £9.81k £12.90k £9.68k £7.20k £9.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0