THE GARNETT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Broad charitable purposes but priority given to animal welfare, enviromental issues, medical research and welfare, the arts and galleries. Charities based in Ireland or the Southwest of England are given additional consideration. Please note most funds are ear-marked and speculative applications will not be considered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1988: Standard registration
- 10 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE AFG CHARITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £4.47k | £3.02k | £2.29k | £416 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.05k | £45.23k | £35.45k | £40.45k | £37.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 09 February 2016 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 08 July 2014 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUNE 1988, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES. PREFERENCE GIVEN TO CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND MORE PARTICULARLY TO DONDUCT CARRY ON ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR SEXES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window