HOPE STREET LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational workshops and performances, training for unemployed people, community engagement projects using the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 27 July 1988: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- NORTHERN LINE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.39k | £207.33k | £173.20k | £155.69k | £108.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.20k | £186.77k | £208.52k | £148.49k | £127.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £35.39k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £35.39k | £45.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 25 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 25 April 2019 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 25 April 2019 | 84 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 14 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 14 December 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, LITERATURE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHOULD BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window