NATIONAL JAZZ ARCHIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Jazz Archive is the UK's research and information centre for jazz, blues and related music, available to the media, researchers, writers, discographers, students and the general enthusiast. Its holding comprises comprehensive book and periodical collections (including many rarities), concert brochures, photographs, letters and a wide variety of related artefacts and memorabilia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- NJA (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL JAZZ FOUNDATION ARCHIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.57k | £48.65k | £40.29k | £50.30k | £50.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.09k | £70.60k | £42.70k | £51.67k | £51.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 1988 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND (IF AND SO OFTEN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OF PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND FOSTERING THE UNDERSTANDING, KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC ESPECIALLY JAZZ AND ITS ASSOCIATED FORMS OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window