GAIA

Charity number: 327903
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects are to promote and advance education for the public benefit in natural and geophysiological sciences, in particular Gaia theory. The activities are to fund a research laboratory and field study centre; to promote Gaia theory through publications and meetings; and to provide occasional research grants to others to support their work on Gaia science.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 August 2015

Total income: £580
Total expenditure: £182,709

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 1988: Standard registration
  • 05 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • "GAIA" (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/08/2015
Total gross income £7.51k £6.38k £3.49k £1.10k £580
Total expenditure £16.86k £12.14k £122.29k £2.50k £182.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2015 25 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 03 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 10 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 17 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required