JAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JAT provides support and counselling for Jewish people living with HIV and their families/carers. It also promotes awareness of sexual health issues; provides outreach and education & challenges stigma about STIs and HIV in & outside the Jewish community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 1988: Standard registration
- JAT (Working name)
- JEWISH AIDS TRUST (Previous name)
- THE JEWISH AIDS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Caroline Hilton | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi David Jonathan Mitchell | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr LOUISE MORGANSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CLINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £402 | £1.44k | £1.16k | £7.16k | £119.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | £2.69k | £7.75k | £1.89k | £12.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1988 REPLACED BY A DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
PROVIDING SEXUAL HEALTH AND HIV AWARENESS PROGRAMMES AND SEXUAL HEALTH AND FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THOSE WITH HIV AND DOING ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR OPINION SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE WHICH ARE IN CONNECTION WITH OR ANCILLARY TO THE OBJECTS OF THIS DEED
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
40A Holly Park
LONDON
N3 3JD
- Phone:
- 07546429885
- Email:
- c.spelman@jat-uk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window