PAPRI - PENSION AND POPULATION RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MCNICHOLAS | Chair |
|
||||||
Brian Stakelum | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARCUS RUBIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 04 May 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING RESEARCH OF A STATISTICAL OR ACTURIAL NATURE INCLUDING THE STUDY OF DEMOGRAPHY, PENSIONS, INSURANCE MATTERS AND INVESTMENT TOPICS AND TO DISSEMINATE TO THE PUBLIC THE FINDINGS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENSION & POPULATION
RESEARCH INSTITUTE
35 CANONBURY ROAD
LONDON
N1 2DG
- Phone:
- 02073545667
- Email:
- papriresearch@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window