Financial history THE AMMCO TRUST

Charity Number: 327962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £60.85k £50.00k £62.00k £65.10k £61.53k
Total expenditure £54.66k £52.41k £72.10k £64.65k £83.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A