THE JOHN BENJAMIN MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 1988: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £523 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF APPLIED PHYSICS RESEARCH OR DEVELOPMENT BY ESTABLISHING CASH OR OTHER PRIZE OR AWARDS TO PERSONS WHO SHOULD BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES AS HAVING MADE OUTSTANDING CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THAT SCIENCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window