Financial history ROWNTREE MACKINTOSH CONFECTIONERY EMPLOYEES COMMUNITY TRUST FUND (CASTLE FORD)

Charity Number: 327990
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/04/2004 28/04/2005 28/04/2006 28/04/2007 28/04/2008
Total gross income £1.42k £1.29k £1.95k £832 £1.28k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.10k £250 £0 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A