THE MICHAEL AND ELIZABETH SHAW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the last FY we made one grant to a charity dealing with the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE JANE SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD OLIVER SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £2.59k | £2.43k | £3.22k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.10k | £2.40k | £2.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor House
Church Road
Upper Farringdon
Alton
GU34 3EG
- Phone:
- 01420587202
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window