INTERDEV LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 January 1989: Standard registration
- 08 July 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- INTERDEV U K (Working name)
- INTERDEV UK (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JANUARY 1989 AND 16 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED HERETO THROUGH ASSISTING THE CHURCH AND ITS VARIOUS SPECIALISED AGENCIES TO WORK TOGETHER IN PARTNERSHIP, ENCOURAGING EFFECTIVENESS IN PLANNING AND USE OF COMMUNICATIONS. THE ORGANISATION WILL FOCUS ITS ENERGIES TO CO-ORDINATE WORK IN SUCH AREAS AS: AGRICULTURE, HEALTH, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, RELIEF, EDUCATION, COMMUNICATIONS AND SPIRITUAL MINISTRY WITHIN THE POPULATION GROUPS SERVED..... SEE CLAUSE 3(A)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window