THE ETHEL FLOYD FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities and transport to enable people, regardless of age or ability, to enjoy excellent meals in a wonderful countryside setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 December 1988: Standard registration
- 09 July 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 August 2012: Re-registered
- 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £86 | £5.70k | £2 | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £1.58k | £6.26k | £452 | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 10 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 24 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR FARM COUNTRY OR OTHER BENEFICIAL OUTINGS FOR VISITS BY THOSE WHO BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WOULD BENEFIT FROM SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window